IL SB1591 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-13)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Creates an exemption for qualified tangible personal property used in the construction or operation of a data center that has been granted a certificate of exemption by the Department of Revenue. Amends the Department of Revenue Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois to add provisions concerning those certificates of exemption. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

USE/OCC TAX-DATA CENTERS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-29SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-29SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
2019-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 009-000-000
2019-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue
2019-05-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2019-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-05-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2019
2019-05-28SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
2019-05-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2019-05-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nathan D. Reitz
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-05-23SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2019-05-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2019-05-22HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-05-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-000-000
2019-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-05-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-05-21HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2019-05-21HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-05-20HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-20HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-09HouseTo Income Tax Subcommittee
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-04-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sims
2019-04-10SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 008-000-000
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2019-04-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2019
2019-04-03SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2019
2019-03-27SenateDo Pass Revenue; 007-000-000
2019-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
2019-03-13SenatePostponed - Revenue
2019-03-06SenatePostponed - Revenue
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Revenue
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2025052505-810New CodeSee Bill Text
351053-5Amended CodeCitation Text
351103-5Amended CodeCitation Text
351153-5Amended CodeCitation Text
351202-5Amended CodeCitation Text
356402-4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1591&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1591.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1591eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1591enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1591sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1591sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1591ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1591_04102019_048000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB1591_05272019_028000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1591ham001_05292019_028000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback