IL SB1595 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0178
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0178
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Film Production Services Tax Credit Act of 2008. Provides that a taxpayer may not take a credit awarded under that Act for tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2027. Effective immediately.
Title
FILM TAX CREDIT-PERMANENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-01 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0178 |
2019-08-01 | Senate | Effective Date August 1, 2019 |
2019-08-01 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 053-003-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 008-001-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2019 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2019-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-009-000 |
2019-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-05-21 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-21 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-05-20 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-20 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-001-001 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 007-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Revenue |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Revenue |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 16 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 16 | 42 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 213 | Amended Code | Citation Text |