IL SB1596 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0006
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0006
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Worker's Compensation Act and the Workers' Occupational Diseases Act. Provides that specified Sections limiting recovery do not apply to injuries or death resulting from an occupational disease as to which the recovery of compensation benefits under the Act would be precluded due to the operation of any period of repose or repose provision. Provides that, as to any such injury occupational disease, the employee, the employee's heirs, and any person having the standing under law to bring a civil action at law has the nonwaivable right to bring such an action against any employer or employers. Effective immediately.
Title
WORKERS' COMPENSATION REPOSE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0006 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Effective Date May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-03-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-040-001 |
2019-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-14 | House | Judicial Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-03-13 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-03-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 008-004-001 |
2019-03-13 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2019-03-13 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 005-002-000 |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-12 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-03-12 | House | Home Rule Note Filed |
2019-03-12 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-03-12 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2019-03-11 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2019-03-11 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed |
2019-03-11 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2019-03-11 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2019-03-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-03-08 | House | State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-03-08 | House | Pension Note Requested by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-03-08 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-03-08 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-03-08 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-03-08 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-03-08 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-03-08 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-03-08 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-03-08 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-03-07 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2019-03-07 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-06 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-03-06 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 041-016-001 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 008-002-000 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 305 | 1.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 305 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 310 | 1.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 310 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 310 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |