IL SB1609 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0408
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0408
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that any person incarcerated on a bailable offense who does not supply bail and against whom a fine is levied on conviction of the offense shall be allowed a credit of $30 (rather than $5) for each day so incarcerated upon application of the defendant.
Title
CRIM PRO-INCARCERATION CREDIT
Sponsors
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] | Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] |
Rep. Gregory Harris [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Jawaharial Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0408 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 037-019-000 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Criminal Law; 006-001-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Criminal Law |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 062-052-000 |
2019-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 031-018-000 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-003-000 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 110-14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |