IL SB1610 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0409
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0409
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that if the defendant is arraigned on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act and the court fails to advise the defendant before the acceptance of a plea of guilty, guilty but mentally ill, or nolo contendere to a misdemeanor or felony offense of the consequences of the defendant's plea, if an alien, and the defendant shows that conviction of the offense to which the defendant pleaded guilty, guilty but mentally ill, or nolo contendere may have the consequence for the defendant of deportation, exclusion from admission to the United States, or denial of naturalization under the laws of the United States, the court, upon the defendant's motion, shall vacate the judgment and permit the defendant to withdraw the plea of guilty, guilty but mentally ill, or nolo contendere and enter a plea of not guilty. Provides that the motion shall be filed within 2 years of the date of the defendant's conviction.
Title
CRIM PRO-ALIEN ADVISEMENT
Sponsors
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Emil Jones [D] |
Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz [D] | Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 84 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0409 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 084-032-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 017-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-06 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-06 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 044-014-000 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-001-000 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 113-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |