IL SB1620 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Procurement of Domestic Products Act. Provides that purchasing agencies shall promote the purchase of and give preference to manufactured articles, materials, and supplies that have been manufactured in Illinois (currently, the United States). Provides that, if the purchasing agency determines that certain conditions apply to a procured product, then, with respect to that procurement, the purchasing agency shall give preference to manufactured articles, materials, and supplies that have been manufactured in the United States. Defines terms. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROCUREMENT-DOMESTIC PRODUCTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-27SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
2019-03-13SenatePostponed - State Government
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-03-06SenatePostponed - State Government
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3051710Amended CodeCitation Text
3051725Amended CodeCitation Text
305175Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback