IL SB1636 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on August 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0432
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on August 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0432
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Contractor Prompt Payment Act. Provides that a retainage of 10% of the payment may be withheld from a payment under a construction contract prior to the completion of 50% of the contract. Provides that after 50% of the contract is completed, the amount of retainage for any subsequent payment may not exceed 5%. Effective immediately.
Title
CONTRACT PROMPT PAY RETAINAGE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0432 |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Effective Date August 20, 2019 |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-013-000 |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-14 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-02 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-03-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 037-011-002 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-002-000 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |