IL SB1657 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mortgage Act. Adds a person authorized by the mortgagor, grantor, heir, legal representative, or assign to the list of those who may request that the mortgagee of real property shall make, execute, and deliver an instrument in writing releasing a mortgage or deed of trust. Provides that if any mortgagee or trustee shall not, within 30 days (rather than "one month") after the payment of the debt secured by the mortgage or trust deed complies with specific requirements, then he or she shall be liable for the sum of $200 to the aggrieved party. Provides that the successor in interest to the mortgagee or trustee shall not be liable for the $200 penalty if he or she complies with specific requirements within 30 days (rather than "one month") after succeeding to the interest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MORTGAGE ACT-AUTHORIZED PERSON

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2019
2019-05-29HouseMotion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-05-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-02HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-30HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 011-000-000
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Financial Institutions Committee
2019-03-21HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-21HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-20HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-03-13HouseArrived in House
2019-03-13SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2019-03-06SenateDo Pass Financial Institutions; 009-000-000
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Financial Institutions
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7659052Amended CodeCitation Text
7659054Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback