IL SB1669 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0561
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0561
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes. Provides that the scratch-off game to benefit school STEAM programming shall be discontinued on January 1, 2021. Further amends the Illinois Lottery Law. Requires the Department of the Lottery to offer a special instant scratch-off game with the title of "The End of Alzheimer's Begins With Me". Requires the net revenue from that game to be deposited into the Alzheimer's Awareness Fund. Authorizes the Department to adopt rules necessary to implement and administer the game. Effective immediately.
Title
LOTTERY-SCRATCH-OFF-SCHOOLS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0561 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date August 23, 2019 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-001-001 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 011-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-003-000 |
2019-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-03-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 038-003-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 018-000-000 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.117a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1605 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1605 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1605 | 21.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 1605 | 9.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |