IL SB1670 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0627
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0627
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Police Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that a police officer who previously participated in the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF) for service as a member of the police department of a municipality and was transferred to that municipality's police pension fund upon its creation under the Downstate Police Article shall, for the purposes of determining the applicable tier of benefits under that Article, be deemed to have become a police officer and member of that municipality's police pension fund on the date that he or she first participated in IMRF as a member of the police department of that municipality, notwithstanding whether that start date was before January 1, 2011. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
PENCD-IMRF-DNST POL-START DATE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-24 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0627 |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Effective Date January 24, 2020 |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-11-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-10-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 079-034-000 |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-10-29 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-10-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-28 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-06-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2019-05-16 | House | Pension Note Requested by Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 006-003-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-03-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 038-002-000 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Government Accountability and Ethics; 008-002-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 3-111.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |