IL SB1671 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Provides that "emerging investment manager" means a qualified investment adviser that manages an investment portfolio of at least $10,000,000 but less than $20,000,000,000 (instead of $10,000,000,000) at the time of the initial contract with the retirement system, pension fund, or investment board and is a minority-owned business, women-owned business, or business owned by a person with a disability. Defines "qualified manager of emerging investment managers services". In a provision requiring a competitive process for awarding investment contracts, adds an exclusion for contracts for investment services with an emerging investment manager provided through a qualified manager of emerging investment managers services. In a provision requiring contracts for investment services to include certain disclosures regarding subcontractors, excludes from the definition of "subcontractor" qualified managers of emerging investment managers services. Provides that based upon a written recommendation from an investment adviser providing qualified manager of emerging investment managers services for the selection or appointment of an emerging investment manager that has been providing investment services in the multimanager portfolio for at least 24 months, the board of a retirement system, pension fund, or investment board may select or appoint such emerging investment manager based upon such recommendation. Requires a qualified manager of emerging investment managers services to comply with specified requirements concerning written contracts.
Title
PENCD-EMRGING INVSTMNT MANAGER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-11-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-10-21 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 27, 2019 |
2019-10-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-21 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-10-21 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-06-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martinez |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Government Accountability and Ethics; 007-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Government Accountability and Ethics; 006-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 1-109.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 1-113.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |