IL SB1680 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that each chief procurement officer has authority to designate as veteran small business set-asides a fair proportion of construction, supply, and service contracts for awards to qualified service-disabled veteran-owned small businesses or veteran-owned small businesses. Provides further requirements concerning veteran small business set-aside designations. Requires each chief procurement officer to report to the General Assembly (currently, Department of Central Management Services) on specified information concerning qualified service-disabled veteran-owned small businesses and veteran-owned small businesses, and requires that the number of bids or offers will be delineated between contracts that were designated as set-aside and those that were not designated as set-aside. Makes other changes.
Title
PROCUREMENT-VETERAN SET-ASIDE
Sponsors
Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] |
Sen. William Cunningham [D] | Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] | Rep. Barbara Hernandez [D] | Rep. Jonathan Pizer [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-29 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-03-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 045-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 26, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 45-57 | Amended Code | Citation Text |