IL SB1689 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that for taxable year 2019, the maximum income limitation under the senior citizens assessment freeze homestead exemption is $75,000 for counties with 3,000,000 or more inhabitants (currently, $65,000). Provides that, for taxable year 2020 and thereafter, the maximum income limitation under the senior citizens assessment freeze homestead exemption is $75,000 for all counties (currently, $65,000). Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-SENIOR FREEZE-INCOME
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. Ram Villivalam [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] |
Rep. Joyce Mason [D] | Rep. Barbara Hernandez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-21 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-13 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-003-000 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 007-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-172 | Amended Code | Citation Text |