IL SB1691 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that a minor who at the time of the offense was at least 16 years of age and who is charged with certain aggravated vehicular hijacking violations or certain armed robbery violations is not subject to the Act and shall be prosecuted under the criminal laws of the State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV CT-EXCLUDED JURISDICTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
2019-03-22SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-05SenateTo Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Steve McClure

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7054055-130Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback