IL SB1693 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Includes, in the minimum curriculum for police training schools, training in investigating domestic minor sex trafficking. Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Provides that a child shall be considered abused regardless of the perpetrator of the abuse if the child is a human trafficking victim. Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides for immediate expungement of juvenile court and law enforcement records of minors who are human trafficking victims involved in prostitution. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that involuntary sexual servitude of a minor includes purchasing sexual services of the minor whether from the trafficker or minor. Provides that it is not a defense to involuntary sexual servitude of a minor that the accused reasonably believed the trafficking victim to be 18 years of age or over. Eliminates other mistake of age defenses concerning grooming and patronizing a minor engaged in prostitution. Provides that a person who is a victim of involuntary sexual servitude of a minor is deemed a crime victim and is eligible for protections afforded to crime victims. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963 to permit a motion to vacate an adjudication of delinquency of a human trafficking victim who engaged in prostitution. Amends the Sex Offender Registration Act. Makes violations concerning trafficking in persons, involuntary servitude, and related offenses registrable offenses under the Act. Amends the Crime Victims Compensation Act to provide that a trafficking victim who is under 18 years of age is not subject to the filing requirements of the Act and is not subject to the eligibility requirements of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HUMAN TRAFFICKING-OMNIBUS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason Plummer
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-03-05SenateTo Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jason Plummer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32553Amended CodeCitation Text
507057Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-301Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-915Amended CodeCitation Text
720510-9Amended CodeCitation Text
720511-14.1Amended CodeCitation Text
720511-18.1Amended CodeCitation Text
720511-20.1Amended CodeCitation Text
720511-25Amended CodeCitation Text
720511-27New CodeSee Bill Text
7255116-2.1Amended CodeCitation Text
7301502Amended CodeCitation Text
740456.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback