IL SB1694 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0347
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0347
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that a school district that maintains any of grades 9 through 12 may include in its high school curriculum a unit of instruction on workplace preparation that covers legal protections in the workplace, including protection against sexual harassment and racial and other forms of discrimination and other protections for employees.
Title
SCH CD-WORKPLACE PREP STUDY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0347 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 020-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bush |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 010-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27-22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |