IL SB1698 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Local Government Officer Compensation Act. Provides that language reducing an elected officer's compensation to zero if he or she is receiving specified pension benefits from the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund does not apply to a unit of local government that has adopted an ordinance or resolution effective prior to January 1, 2019 that: (i) reduces the compensation of an official of the unit of local government who is receiving specified pension benefits from the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund; and (ii) changes the official's position to part-time. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-BROADCAST MEETINGS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 83 N: 29 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-12-15 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - November 12, 2019 |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2019-10-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 083-029-001 |
2019-10-29 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-10-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-28 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-28 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Personnel & Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-10-28 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 007-002-000 |
2019-10-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-10-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-10-21 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 27, 2019 |
2019-10-21 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-10-21 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-29 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-03-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Government Accountability and Ethics; 010-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 1-113.16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |