IL SB1699 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0433
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0433
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Prohibits, with exceptions, a law enforcement agency from publishing booking photographs on its social networking website (instead of its social media website). Provides that "social networking website" has the meaning provided in the Right to Privacy in the Workplace Act. Adds the same restrictions to the State Records Act. Effective immediately.
Title
GOVT RECORDS-SOCIAL NETWORKING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0433 |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Effective Date August 20, 2019 |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-001 |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 017-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-03-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 2.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 160 | 4a | Amended Code | Citation Text |