IL SB1707 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Equal Pay Act of 2003. Prohibits an employer from: (i) screening job applicants based on their wage or salary history, (ii) requiring that an applicant's prior wages satisfy minimum or maximum criteria, and (iii) requesting or requiring as a condition of being interviewed or as a condition of continuing to be considered for an offer of employment that an applicant disclose prior wages or salary. Prohibits an employer from seeking the salary, including benefits or other compensation or salary history, of a job applicant from any current or former employer, with some exceptions. Provides for employers to establish a self-evaluation plan of the employer's pay practices. Sets forth permissible components of a self-evaluation plan. Requires the self-evaluation plan to be submitted to the Department of Labor for verification. Provides that an employer that has completed a self-evaluation plan that has been verified by the Department of Labor has an affirmative defense to liability for certain alleged violations of the Act. Provides that an employer that does not have a verified self-evaluation plan may be subject to civil penalties for violations of the Act. Limits defenses. Provides for penalties and injunctive relief.
Title
EQUAL PAY ACT-WAGE HISTORY
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. William Cunningham [D] | Sen. Steven Landek [D] | Sen. Scott Bennett [D] |
Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] | Sen. Christopher Belt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 112 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 112 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 112 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1707&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1707.htm |