IL SB1719 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a Keep the Internet Devices Safe Act that is different from the introduced bill. Removes legislative findings and intent. Provides that a "digital device" is an Internet-connected device that contains a microphone. Provides that no private entity may turn on or enable a digital device's microphone unless the registered owner or person (instead of user of the device) configuring the device is provided certain notices in a consumer agreement (instead of a written policy). Provides that a manufacturer of a digital device that does not cause to be turned on or otherwise use a digital device's microphone is not subject to the restrictions on the use of a digital device's microphone. Deletes provisions regarding violations of the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that the exclusive authority to enforce the Act is vested in the Attorney General.
Title
KEEP INTERNET DEVICES SAFE ACT
Sponsors
Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. Melinda Bush [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
Sen. Robert Peters [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-17 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2020-02-26 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-06-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2019 |
2019-05-28 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-28 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-005-000 |
2019-05-24 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-24 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 039-014-000 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Castro |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Telecommunications and Information Technology; 005-003-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Telecommunications and Information Technology |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 26, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Do Pass Telecommunications and Information Technology; 006-002-000 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Telecommunications and Information Technology |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 505 | 2Z | Amended Code | Citation Text |