IL SB1726 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-11)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Alzheimer's Disease Research Act. Changes the short title of the Act to the Alzheimer's Disease Research, Care, and Support Fund Act. Creates the full-time position of Dementia Coordinator within the Department of Public Health, who is responsible only for activities associated with and relevant to the successful implementation of the State of Illinois Alzheimer's Disease State Plan. Changes the name of the Alzheimer's Disease Research Fund to the Alzheimer's Disease Research, Care, and Support Fund and makes corresponding changes in the State Finance Act. Provides that moneys from the Fund shall be used to cover costs, including the Dementia Coordinator's salary and expenses. Provides that the Department shall be responsible for providing the Dementia Coordinator with administrative support through its existing resources and not from the Fund. Repeals provisions concerning a grant program administered by the Department. Amends the Alzheimer's Disease Assistance Act. Makes changes concerning the membership of the Alzheimer's Disease Advisory Committee. Requires the Department of Public Health to make reasonable efforts to promote the Alzheimer's Disease Research, Care, and Support Fund during relevant times, including, but not limited to, periods of time when tax returns are typically received, such as issuing press releases and posting on social media.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ALZHEIMER'S-ADVISORY COMMITTEE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
2019-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2019-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-29SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2019-05-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2019-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 014-000-000
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2019-05-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2019-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-05-02HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-02HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-04-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-04-11HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-04-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019
2019-04-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Public Health
2019-04-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2019-04-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-03-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-03-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass as Amended Public Health; 008-000-000
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-03-12SenatePostponed - Public Health
2019-03-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health
2019-03-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2019-03-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-03-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2019-03-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2019-03-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2019-03-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2019-03-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-03-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2019-03-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-03-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-03-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Public Health
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.180Amended CodeCitation Text
4104056Amended CodeCitation Text
4104058New CodeSee Bill Text
4104101Amended CodeCitation Text
4104102Amended CodeCitation Text
4104103Amended CodeCitation Text
4104103.1New CodeSee Bill Text
4104103.2New CodeSee Bill Text
4104103.3New CodeSee Bill Text
4104104Repealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback