IL SB1730 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that, for State Fiscal Year 2020, the Department of Children and Family Services shall increase reimbursement rates payable to each private agency with a purchase of service contract or grant from the Department to an amount that equals the sum of all increases in general inflation during State Fiscal Years 2014 through 2018 as determined by the consumer price index-u published by the Bureau of Labor Statistics of the United States Department of Labor, less any rate increases, previously provided by the Department. Sets forth the types of services eligible for the increased reimbursement rate, including, (i) residential services, (ii) specialized, adolescent, treatment, or other non-traditional or Home-of-Relative foster care services, and (iii) intact family services. Provides that beginning in State Fiscal Year 2020, and for every State fiscal year thereafter, the Department shall implement the rate reimbursement methodology outlined in a specified provision of the Illinois Administrative Code when calculating and determining the payment rates for private agencies that contract with the Department to provide specified services. Provides that, for State Fiscal Year 2021, and for every State fiscal year thereafter, foster parent rates and payment rates for other specified services shall be adjusted each year to an amount that equals any increase in general inflation as determined by the consumer price index-u. Effective immediately.
Title
DCFS-PAYMENT RATE INCREASES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations I |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |