IL SB1743 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-7)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0166
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-7)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0166
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Requires the Department of Children and Family Services, in coordination with specified entities, to develop and process a standardized survey to gather feedback from children who are aging out of foster care and from children who have transitioned out of the foster care system. Provides that the survey shall include requests for information regarding the children's experience with and opinion of State foster care services, the children's recommendations for improvement of such services, the amount of time the children spent in the foster care system, and any other information deemed relevant by the Department. Provides that after the survey is created the Department shall circulate the survey to all youth participating in transitional living programs, independent living programs, or Youth in College and to all youth receiving scholarships or tuition waivers under the DCFS Scholarship Program. Requires the Department to conduct the survey every 5 years and to submit a report to the Governor and the General Assembly at the completion of each survey. Provides that the first report shall be submitted no later than December 1, 2021 and shall provide a detailed review of the survey results.
Title
DCFS-FOSTER CARE SURVEY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0166 |
2019-07-26 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-07-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 008-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Human Services |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2019 |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2019-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-26 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-21 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-03-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-001-002 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 010-000-000 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |