IL SB1755 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that "sale at retail" does not include the selling of food at retail to students, teachers, or staff during a school district designated breakfast or lunch period, serving some or all of grades kindergarten through 12.
Title
USE/OCC TX-SCHOOL LUNCH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-04-16 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; McConchie |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 007-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 007-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 120 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |