IL SB1756 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0608
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0608
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code to require certain insurance companies to comply with prohibitions under the Managed Care Reform and Patient Rights Act. Amends the Health Maintenance Organization Act. Changes the term "managed care organization" to "health maintenance organization" in a provision concerning an assessment imposed under the Illinois Public Aid Code. Effective immediately, except that provisions under the Illinois Insurance Code are effective January 1, 2020.
Title
INSURANCE-MANAGED CARE-HMO
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Sen. Jason Plummer [R] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Rep. Bob Morgan [D] |
Rep. Blaine Wilhour [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-14 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0608 |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020; Some Provisions |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Effective Date December 13, 2019; Some Provisions |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-11-14 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 050-000-000 |
2019-11-14 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-11-14 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-11-14 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-11-14 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - November 14, 2019 |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2019-11-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-11-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-005-001 |
2019-11-14 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-11-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-11-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-11-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-11-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-11-13 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-11-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Appropriations-Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-11-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-11-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-11-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-11-07 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-10-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 27, 2019 |
2019-10-28 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2019-10-28 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Appropriations-Human Services Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-10-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-10-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-10-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 006-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |