IL SB1758 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0563
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0563
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Consumer Installment Loan Act and the Payday Loan Reform Act. Provides that "substantially equal installment" includes a last regularly scheduled payment that is no more than 5% as large as the previous scheduled payment according to a disclosed payment schedule agreed to by the parties. Effective immediately.
Title
INSTALLMENT/PAYDAY LOANS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0563 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date August 23, 2019 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 014-000-001 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-001 |
2019-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Financial Institutions Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Financial Institutions Committee |
2019-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 26, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 670 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 122 | 2-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |