IL SB1759 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that "electioneering communication" also means a digital communication and includes any communication that is placed or promoted on an online platform. Provides the requirements for an online platform. Provides that the requirements do no apply to a news medium or reporter as defined in the Code of Civil Procedure. In provisions concerning disclosures in political communications, provides that a political committee that pays for a specified political communication must be identified conspicuously within the communication. Provides that a communication does not make a statement in a clear and conspicuous manner if it is difficult to read or hear or if the placement is easily overlooked. Provides that each provider of electioneering communications shall make reasonable efforts to ensure that electioneering communications are not purchased by a foreign national, directly or indirectly.
Title
DIGITAL ELECTION COMMUNICATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Election Law |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 9-1.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 9-1.5a | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9-10.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9-9.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 9-9.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1759&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1759.htm |