IL SB1760 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the New Vehicle Buyer Protection Act of 2019. Provides that if a manufacturer is unable to service or repair a new motor vehicle to conform to the applicable written warranties after a reasonable number of attempts, the manufacturer shall either promptly replace the new motor vehicle or make restitution to the buyer. Provides that it shall be presumed that a reasonable number of attempts have been made to conform a new motor vehicle to the applicable express warranties if, within 18 months from delivery to the buyer or 18,000 miles on the odometer of the vehicle: (1) the same nonconformity results in a condition that is likely to cause death or serious bodily injury if the vehicle is driven after 2 or more repairs; (2) the same nonconformity has been subject to repair 4 or more times; or (3) the vehicle is out of service by reason of repair for more than 30 calendar days since delivery of the vehicle to the buyer. Requires a buyer to initiate a qualified third-party dispute resolution process, if available, before asserting the presumption that a reasonable number of attempts have been made to repair the nonconformity. Prohibits a person from selling a motor vehicle without first disclosing to the prospective buyer that the vehicle had a nonconformity and the nonconformity was corrected. Contains provisions concerning a "Lemon Law Buyback" decal; a warranty buyback notice; remedies; a manufacturer's fee for each vehicle sold; sales and use tax reimbursements; and other matters. Amends the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act and the Illinois Vehicle Code. Changes references to "New Vehicle Buyer Protection Act" to "New Vehicle Buyer Protection Act of 2019". Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Motor Vehicle Dispute Resolution Certification Fund. Repeals the New Vehicle Buyer Protection Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEHICLE BUYER PROTECTION 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-04-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-04-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-04-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-03-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 26, 2019
2019-03-21SenateDo Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 009-000-000
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-03-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-14SenatePostponed - Commerce and Economic Development
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.891New CodeSee Bill Text
351206Amended CodeCitation Text
62555-104.2Amended CodeCitation Text
815380ActRepealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback