IL SB1765 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0352
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0352
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following change. Removes changes made to provisions concerning an optional increase in retirement annuity.
Title
PEN CD-CHI TEACHERS-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0352 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-004-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-13 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-29 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-03-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Government Accountability and Ethics; 009-000-001 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 17-116.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-116.3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-116.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-116.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-116.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-119.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |