IL SB1778 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Removes the list of mandated reports under the Act and instead lists several categories of professionals required to report suspected child abuse and neglect to the Department of Children and Family Services, including: (1) medical personnel; (2) social services and mental health personnel; and (3) crisis intervention personnel. Provides that when 2 or more persons who work within the same workplace and are required to report under the Act share a reasonable cause to believe that a child may be an abused or neglected child, a single report may be made by a designated reporter. Provides that nothing in the Act requires a child to come before the mandated reporter in order for the reporter to make a report of suspected child abuse or child neglect. Provides that persons required to report under the Act must complete mandated reporter training provided through or approved by the Department and that the training must be completed within a specified timeframe. Requires the Department to adopt rules by January 1, 2020 on its process for approving mandated reporter training. Provides that, by January 1, 2021, continuing education requirements for persons licensed by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation must include mandated reporter training. Requires the Department, by January 1, 2020, to adopt rules and procedures for educating members of the public about their right to report child abuse or neglect. Requires the Department to seek assistance from businesses and organizations on raising awareness about child abuse and child neglect and the Department's statewide toll-free child abuse hotline.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ANCRA-MANDATED REPORTERS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-05-16HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-05-09HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-05-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-07HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 008-004-001
2019-05-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-05-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
2019-05-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
2019-04-26HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-04-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 043-008-000
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Morrison
2019-04-10SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 006-004-000
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2019
2019-04-04SenateSecond Reading
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2019
2019-03-27SenateDo Pass as Amended Human Services; 007-001-002
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2019-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
2019-03-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-20SenatePostponed - Human Services
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-12SenatePostponed - Human Services
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-03-05SenatePostponed - Human Services
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Human Services
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
325511.5Amended CodeCitation Text
32554Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback