IL SB1781 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Enterprise Zone Act. Provides that a business that intends to establish a new utility-scale solar power facility may apply for a high impact business designation. Amends the Illinois Power Agency Act. Increases the long-term renewable procurement plan goals after the 2025 delivery year. Requires the long-term renewable procurement plan to include the procurement of new renewable energy credits. Provides that the Adjustable Block program shall be designed to be continuously open. Authorizes utilities to recover certain costs related to the Adjustable Block program. Excludes certain costs from a limitation on the costs of the Adjustable Block program. Makes other changes concerning the Adjustable Block program. Amends the Public Utilities Act. Requires the Illinois Commerce Commission to open a proceeding to update the interconnection standards and applicable utility tariffs. Requires the Commission to revise certain standards for interconnection based on specified criteria. Establishes an interconnection working group. Makes changes to provisions concerning net metering and the distributed generation rebate. Requires the Commission, in consultation with the Illinois Power Agency, to study and produce a report analyzing the potential for and barriers to the implementation of energy storage in Illinois. Requires the Agency to include a plan to procure energy from energy storage resources as part of its procurement plan for 2021. Extends a provision concerning a review, reconciliation, and true-up associated with renewable energy resources' collections and costs. Makes other changes. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act to authorize emergency rulemaking. Effective immediately.
Title
RENEWABLE ENERGY-VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Re-assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3855 | 1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 655 | 5.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-107.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-107.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-107.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 16-108 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-111.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 5-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |