IL SB1793 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Creates an advisory board in the Chicago Fire Department to recommend to the Fire Commissioner of the Chicago Fire Department the best candidates for each position of temporary fire chief and temporary paramedic chief. Defines terms. Requires that the Fire Commissioner provide notice of positions to which he or she will be appointing fire chiefs or paramedic chiefs and a list of qualified candidates for each position. Provides that the Fire Commissioner may appoint fire chiefs and paramedic chiefs after receiving recommendations from the advisory board if the candidates meet specified criteria. Provides that the advisory board shall make rules and procedures and that the City of Chicago shall provide administrative and other support to the advisory board. Limits home rule powers. Effective immediately.
Title
CHICAGO FD-CHIEF ADVISORY BD
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 007-002-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |