IL SB1796 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Defines "servicemember" and "veteran". Provides that a person commits aggravated assault or aggravated battery when he or she commits an assault or a battery against a servicemember or veteran. Provides that an aggravated assault committed against a servicemember or veteran is a Class A misdemeanor. Provides that an aggravated battery committed against a servicemember or veteran is a Class 3 felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AGG ASSAULT&BAT-VET&SERVICEMEM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-04-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-04-30HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael D. Unes
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-04-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-04-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-19SenateReported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Reported Back To Criminal Law
2019-03-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2019-03-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2019-03-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-05SenateTo Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2019-02-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart
2019-02-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2019-02-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720512-0.1Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-2Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-3.05Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback