IL SB1800 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0355
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0355
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that taxpayers (other than estates, trusts, partnerships, Subchapter S corporations, and farmers) are required to pay estimated tax if the amount payable can reasonably be expected to be more than $1,000 (currently, $500). Provides that corporations are required to pay estimated tax if the amount payable can reasonably be expected to be more than $400 (which is the same as current law). Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-ESTIMATED TAX
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0355 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2019-03-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 007-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 803 | Amended Code | Citation Text |