IL SB1813 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-8)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0567
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-8)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0567
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Credit Union Act. Provides that if the Act requires information to be written or delivered in writing, an electronic record or delivery satisfies the rule of law. Provides that if the Act requires a policy, record, notice, or other document or information to be mailed or otherwise furnished or disclosed by a credit union, electronic distribution or delivery satisfies the rule of law. Provides that a policy adopted by the board may delegate expulsion authority to senior management officials of the credit union. Provides that a member expelled by a senior management official may seek reinstatement by appealing the action within 30 days of expulsion to the board of directors, and that the board may affirm, disaffirm, or modify the action, and the board's decision is final. Provides that a credit union may invest in securities, obligations, or other instruments of or issued by entities properly registered with or licensed by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation. Increases a credit union's aggregate loan amount and the total amount of funds not used in loans to members that may be invested in shares and stocks of Credit Union Service Organizations to 10% (instead of 3%) of the paid-in and unimpaired capital and surplus of the credit union. Modifies a credit union's investment limit in shares or stocks of Credit Union Service Organizations to not exceed 10% (instead of 3%) of the paid-in and unimpaired capital and surplus of the credit union or the amount authorized for federal credit unions. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
CREDIT UNION ACT-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 88 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 88 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0567 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date August 23, 2019 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 006-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 088-027-000 |
2019-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-29 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 009-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Financial Institutions Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-05-28 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-28 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Financial Institutions Committee; Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Financial Institutions Committee |
2019-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-05-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-28 | House | Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Mulroe |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Mulroe |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Financial Institutions; 006-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Financial Institutions; 006-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Financial Institutions |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Financial Institutions; 009-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 305 | 10.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
205 | 305 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 305 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 305 | 44 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 305 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 305 | 57.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 305 | 59 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 305 | 63 | Amended Code | Citation Text |