IL SB1817 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that the tax imposed on mid-range ethanol blends applies to (i) 80% of the proceeds of sales made on or after July 1, 2019 and on or before December 31, 2023 and (ii) 100% of the proceeds of sales made thereafter. Provides that the term "mid-range ethanol blend" means a blend of gasoline and denatured ethanol that contains not less than 20% but less than 51% denatured ethanol. Makes changes to the definitions of "gasohol" and "majority blended ethanol fuel" to adjust the required percentage of ethanol. Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC TX-MID-RANGE ETHANOL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-06 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Tax Exemptions and Credits |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 105 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-44 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-44.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 110 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1817&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1817.htm |