IL SB1827 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Creates a uniform statement of economic interest form that must be completed by all persons who are required to file that form under the Act. Changes the nature of the required disclosures that must be made. Requires candidates filing for Supreme Court Judge, appellate court judge, or circuit court judge to file his or her statement of economic interests in written or printed form. Repeals a provision that established a separate form for persons required to file a statement of economic interests with county clerks. Defines terms. Adds applicability clause. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
GOVT ETHICS-ECONOMIC INTERESTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2020-06-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2020-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2020-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-05-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-005-000 |
2020-05-21 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2020-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2020-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris; ; filed by 3 pm deadline |
2020-05-20 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2020-05-20 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris |
2020-05-20 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Legislation Considered in Special Session No. 1 |
2019-11-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-11-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-03-13 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 017-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 170 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 420 | 1-102.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-104.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-104.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-104.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-105.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-105.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-105.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-105.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-105.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-105.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 420 | 1-112.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-113.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-113.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 4A-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 420 | 4A-103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 420 | 4A-104 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 420 | 4A-108 | Amended Code | Citation Text |