IL SB1828 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-4)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0356
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-4)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0356
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Needle and Hypodermic Syringe Access Program Act. Provides that persons or entities that promote scientifically proven ways of mitigating health risks associated with drug use and other high-risk behaviors may establish and operate a needle and hypodermic syringe access program. Provides objectives for programs established under the Act. Includes language requiring programs to provide specified services. Provides that no employee or volunteer of or participant in a program shall be charged with or prosecuted for possession of specified substances. Provides that law enforcement officers who in good faith arrest or charge a person entitled to immunity under the Act shall not be subject to civil liability for the arrest or filing of charges. Provides that prior to commencing operations under the Act, an organization shall report specified information to the Department of Public Health. Amends the Alcoholism and Other Drug Abuse and Dependency Act. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall give preference for grants and proposals to specified drug overdose prevention programs. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall conduct an evidence-based treatment needs assessment to be submitted to the General Assembly by December 31, 2019. Effective immediately.
Title
NEEDLE AND HYPODERMIC ACCESS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0356 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-011-000 |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 016-000-000 |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 046-003-000 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bush |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 007-001-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 007-001-000 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 301 | 25-13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 301 | 5-23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |