IL SB1838 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Creates the School District Efficiency Commission. Provides for the membership and support of the Commission. Requires the Commission to make recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on the number of school districts in this State, the optimal amount of enrollment for a school district, and where reorganization and realignment of school districts would be beneficial in this State; specifies the topics on which the recommendations must focus. Provides that, on or before May 1, 2020, the Commission must vote on its recommendations and submit a report to the Governor and the General Assembly. Provides that if the Commission adopts the report recommendations by an affirmative vote of at least 11 of its members, then the Commission's recommendations for reorganization of school districts into unit school districts must be placed on the ballots of the designated school districts in the next general election in the same manner as petitions approved by a regional superintendent of schools, except without financial incentives. Provides that the Commission is dissolved the day after the report is filed with the Governor and the General Assembly. Repeals the provision on February 1, 2021. Makes a conforming change in the Conversion and Formation of School Districts Article. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH DISTRICT EFFICIENCY COMM
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] | Sen. Dan McConchie [R] | Sen. William Cunningham [D] | Sen. Suzanne Glowiak Hilton [D] |
Sen. Steven Landek [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Sen. Jason Plummer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Education |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Education |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 008-003-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 008-002-001 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 014-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 11E-135 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 11E-140 | New Code | See Bill Text |