IL SB1839 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0420
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0420
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Pharmacy Practice Act. In provisions exempting from the Act the sale or distribution of dialysate or devices necessary to perform home peritoneal renal dialysis for patients with end-stage renal disease, provides that an agent of the manufacturer who lawfully holds the dialysate or devices may be registered as a manufacturer, third-party logistics provider, or wholesaler (rather than a manufacturer or wholesaler). Amends the Wholesale Drug Distribution Licensing Act. Requires that each resident third-party logistics provider must be licensed by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation, and every non-resident third-party logistics provider must be licensed in this State, in accordance with the Act, prior to shipping a prescription drug into this State (and removes language requiring a third-party logistics provider to be licensed as a wholesale distributor and, in order to be considered part of the normal distribution channel, to be an authorized distributor of record). Provides that each third-party logistics provider must designate an individual representative who shall serve as the contact person for the Department, and requires the individual representative to provide the Department with certain information. Prohibits a third-party logistics provider from operating from a place of residence, and requires a third-party logistics provider facility to be located apart and separate from any retail pharmacy licensed by the Department. Provides that the Department may not issue a third-party logistics provider license to an applicant, unless the Department first: ensures that a physical inspection of the facility satisfactory to the Department has occurred at the address provided by the applicant; and determines that the designated representative meets specified qualifications. Requires a third-party logistics provider to publicly display all licenses and have the most recent state and federal inspection reports readily available. Makes conforming changes throughout the Act. Provides that an application (rather than application blanks) for renewal of a license shall be mailed or emailed (rather than mailed) to each licensee at least 60 days before the license expires. Effective immediately.
Title
DRUG DISTRIB-LOGISTIC PROVIDER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0420 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Effective Date August 16, 2019 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 009-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Health Care Licenses Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-14 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-07 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-02 | House | First Reading |
2019-05-01 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-05-01 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; T. Cullerton |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 006-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 2, 2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities; 006-000-000 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 120 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |