IL SB1852 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-6)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that in the event of an ethylene oxide leak a facility shall issue a notice to all affected property owners and local government within 2,500 feet of the leak site. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EPA-PERMITS-ETHYLENE OXIDE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-21SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0022
2019-06-21SenateEffective Date June 21, 2019
2019-06-21SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-05SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 053-000-000
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 007-000-000
2019-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Environment and Conservation
2019-05-27SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-27SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John F. Curran
2019-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 28, 2019
2019-05-27SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2019-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-05-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-001
2019-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
2019-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 027-000-000
2019-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee
2019-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin
2019-05-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2019-05-22HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 026-000-000
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
2019-05-22HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2019-05-22HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Energy & Environment Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin
2019-05-22HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-22HouseAssigned to Energy & Environment Committee
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Energy & Environment Committee
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-04-11HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-04-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Curran
2019-04-10SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 007-000-000
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019
2019-04-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran
2019-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 19, 2019
2019-03-14SenateDo Pass Environment and Conservation; 009-000-000
2019-03-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41559.16New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1852&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1852.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1852eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1852enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0022.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1852sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1852sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1852ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1852ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1852_04102019_076000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB1852_05242019_012000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1852ham002_05302019_012000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback