IL SB1857 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0645
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the repeal of specified provisions in specified Acts. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EXTEND REPEAL DATES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-21 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-26SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0645
2020-06-26SenateEffective Date June 26, 2020
2020-06-26SenateGovernor Approved
2020-06-15SenateSent to the Governor
2020-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended
2020-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended
2020-05-21SenatePassed Both Houses
2020-05-21SenateSenate Concurs
2020-05-21SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 051-000-000
2020-05-21SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 051-000-000
2020-05-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3 - May 21, 2020
2020-05-21SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2020-05-21SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2020-05-21SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2020-05-21SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2020-05-21SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2020-05-21SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2020-05-21SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2020-05-21SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3
2020-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2020-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-002
2020-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2020-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2020-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2020-05-21HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2020-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2020-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 013-000-000
2020-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
2020-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
2020-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2020-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2020-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2020-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended
2020-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended
2020-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2020-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Pension Note Filed as Amended
2020-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
2020-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
2020-05-21HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2020-05-20HouseLegislation Considered in Special Session No. 1
2020-05-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed by Voice Vote
2020-05-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris
2020-05-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2020-05-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2020-05-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2020-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2020-05-18HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-12-16HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-12-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-10-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2019-10-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-10-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-10-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2019-10-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-10-28HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-06-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2019
2019-05-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-02HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-01HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000
2019-04-24HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2019-04-04HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-04HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-04HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2019-04-04HouseArrived in House
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-001
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2019
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass State Government; 009-000-000
2019-03-13SenatePostponed - State Government
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5460105New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1857&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1857.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1857eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1857enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0645.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1857ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1857ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1857ham003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1857_04042019_003000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB1857_05212020_002000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1857ham003_05212020_006001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1857ham002_05212020_006000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback