IL SB1868 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0435
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0435
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Limitations Article of the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that if there is evidence that childhood sexual abuse was committed by a person who holds a position of trust, authority, or supervision over the minor victim, and that person fraudulently concealed a cause of action from the knowledge of the minor victim, the action may be commenced at any time within 5 years after the person entitled to bring the action discovers that he or she has such cause of action, and any repose or limitation period is tolled during that 5-year period. Effective immediately.
Title
LIMITATIONS-CHILD SEX ABUSE
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Link [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Sen. Steven Landek [D] |
Rep. Ann Williams [D] | Rep. Deanne Mazzochi [R] | Rep. Barbara Hernandez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0435 |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Effective Date August 20, 2019 |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2019-05-08 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000 |
2019-04-26 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-04 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-04-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-003-000 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 13-202.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |