IL SB1878 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with changes. Provides that when any person who has not previously been convicted of a violation of certain financial crime enterprise offenses or convicted of any similar offense in another state is arrested for and charged with a misdemeanor offense of theft or retail theft, the court may with the consent of the defendant and the State's Attorney, continue the matter to allow the defendant to participate and complete the Misdemeanor Retail Theft and Theft Diversionary Program (in the introduced bill, when any person who has not previously been convicted of any felony offense under the laws of the State or the laws of another state or federal law which would be classified as a felony offense in the State is arrested for and charged with a misdemeanor offense of theft or retail theft, with the consent of the defendant and the State's Attorney, the court may continue the matter to allow the defendant to participate and complete the Misdemeanor Retail Theft and Theft Diversionary Program). Provides that a person may only have one discharge and dismissal under the Program within a 3-year period.
Title
CD CORR-RETAIL THEFT PROGRAM
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Plummer [R] | Sen. John Cullerton [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] |
Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-001 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason Plummer |