IL SB1880 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes various appropriations to the Department of Human Services from the General Revenue Fund for rate increases for certified community mental health centers and community day services providers and grants to licensed providers of community-based addiction treatment services for persons with substance use disorders, reducing uncompensated hours in community-integrated living arrangements, increasing base nursing reimbursements to nurses in 5 to 8 bed community-integrated living arrangements, and increasing administration cost reimbursements in community-integrated living arrangements. Effective July 1, 2019.
Title
$DHS-COMM MENTAL HEALTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations I |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1880&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/PDF/10100SB1880.pdf |