IL SB1882 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0436
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0436
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends Evidence Article of the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that if a defendant's counsel seeks to discover the identity of an informant, then the defendant's counsel shall file a motion with the court alleging a good faith factual basis for believing that the prior representation of the informant creates a serious potential for an actual conflict of interest. Provides that the court: may deny the motion for lack of a factual basis; or, if it finds a sufficiently alleged factual basis, shall conduct an in camera hearing with the informant to ascertain whether an actual conflict of interest exists. Provides that if the court conducts an in camera hearing, the court shall: deny the motion if there is no basis to conclude that a serious potential for an actual conflict exists; or inform the petitioning counsel that his or her continued representation is a conflict. Provides that if the court concludes that a conflict exists, it shall notify the counsel of the nature of the conflict, subject to any condition of nondisclosure the court deems appropriate. Effective immediately.
Title
EVIDENCE-INFORMANT PRIVILEGE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0436 |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Effective Date August 20, 2019 |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-18 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 8-802.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |