IL SB1889 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0569
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0569
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Contains findings concerning the Child Protection Training Academy (Academy) developed in 2015 by the Department of Children and Family Services in collaboration with the University of Illinois at Springfield and the Academy's innovative approach to training frontline child protection investigators using experiential learning through simulations. Provides that subject to appropriation, the training efforts of the Academy shall include, but not be limited to: (i) the continued development and implementation of simulation training for investigation, intact, and permanency supervisors; (ii) the development of simulation training for intact and permanency workers both in the Department and at private agencies; and (iii) laboratory training facilities that may include, but not be limited to, mock houses, mock courtrooms, mock medical facilities, and mock forensic interview rooms. Provides that by July 1, 2020, the Department of Children and Family Services may adopt procedures for the administration of the Child Protection Training Academy that establish certain competence, assessment, and training standards for child welfare service providers and other matters. Requires the Department to continue to arrange for an independent evaluation of the Child Protection Training Academy through June 2021, inclusive of the first 5 years of operation. Provides that nothing in the amendatory Act prohibits the Department from administering simulation training with other entities outside of the University of Illinois at Springfield. Provides that the Department may contract with any entity to provide all aspects of child welfare training. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE CONTRACTING TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0569 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date August 23, 2019 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 008-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Human Services |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-01 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-05-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-04-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2019-04-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-03-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 010-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 5140 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 5140 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |