IL SB1890 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that whenever the appearance in person in court, in either a civil or criminal proceeding, is required of anyone held in a place of custody or confinement operated by the State or any of its political subdivisions, including counties and municipalities, the chief judge of the circuit by rule may permit the personal appearance to be made by means of two-way audio-visual communication, including closed circuit television and computerized video conference at a sentencing hearing for a defendant who: (i) at the time of the proceeding was serving a sentence of imprisonment for another offense; and (ii) has agreed to enter a negotiated plea.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM PRO-VIDEO-SENTENCING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0018
2019-06-20SenateEffective Date June 20, 2019; ; some provisions effective 1-1-20
2019-06-20SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-10SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-29SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-29SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
2019-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2019-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2019-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2019-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3 - May 28, 2019
2019-05-27SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-05-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2019-05-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2019-05-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000
2019-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
2019-05-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-21HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
2019-05-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan
2019-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
2019-05-15HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-15HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-03-21HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-21HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-20HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-03-20HouseArrived in House
2019-03-20SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2019-03-05SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7255106D-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1890&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1890.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1890eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1890enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0018.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1890ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1890ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1890ham003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1890_03202019_010000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB1890_05272019_002000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1890ham003_05292019_010001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1890ham001_05292019_010000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback