IL SB1909 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Requires certain group health insurance policies and other specified policies to provide coverage of medically necessary treatment for postpartum complications as determined by the woman's treating physician. Makes conforming changes in the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971, the Counties Code, the Illinois Municipal Code, the School Code, the Health Maintenance Organization Act, and the Voluntary Health Services Plans Act. Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Adds provisions regarding birthing facilities and neonatal and maternal care designations. Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Provides that the Department of Human Services may establish the Nurse-Family Partnership Pilot Program. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that women during pregnancy and during a 12-month (rather than 60-day) period are eligible for medical assistance. Provides that otherwise eligible women shall receive coverage for doula services, perinatal depression screenings, and other services. Provides that the Department of Children and Family Services shall seek approval of a State Plan amendment to expand coverage for family planning services to women whose income is at or below 200% of the federal poverty level. Makes other changes. Amends the Adoption Act. Removes a rebuttable presumption regarding a parent's unfitness if, at birth, the urine, blood, or meconium of the parent's child contains any amount of specified controlled substances. Makes conforming changes to the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act and the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HEALTH-PREGNANCY/POSTPARTUM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 011-004-000
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2019-04-12HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-04-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-001-000
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Castro
2019-04-11SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Re-referred to Assignments
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Postponed - Public Health
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 005-003-000
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019
2019-04-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2019-04-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-04-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-03-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass as Amended Public Health; 007-003-000
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2019-03-12SenatePostponed - Public Health
2019-03-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health
2019-03-12SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-05SenatePostponed - Public Health
2019-03-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health
2019-03-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2019-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Public Health
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-22.3fAmended CodeCitation Text
20130510-24New CodeSee Bill Text
2023102310-455New CodeSee Bill Text
2151255-3Amended CodeCitation Text
21516510Amended CodeCitation Text
2155356z.33New CodeSee Bill Text
30555-2Amended CodeCitation Text
30555-5Amended CodeCitation Text
30555-5.24Amended CodeCitation Text
32553Amended CodeCitation Text
53756.11Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1069.3Amended CodeCitation Text
65510-4-2.3Amended CodeCitation Text
7054052-18Amended CodeCitation Text
7054052-3Amended CodeCitation Text
750501Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback