IL SB1911 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Business Enterprise for Minorities, Women, and Persons with Disabilities Act. Provides that the term "business" means a business that has annual gross sales of less than $150,000,000 (currently, $75,000,000) as evidenced by the federal income tax return of the business.
Title
BUSINESS ENTERPRISE-BUSINESS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 005-000-000 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 575 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |